USA v. Lowe
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00133-58478 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
53
06/16/2018
Notice (Other)
54
06/22/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
55
06/24/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
56
06/24/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
57
06/25/2018
Trial Brief
58
06/25/2018
Notice (Other)
59
06/26/2018
DEPS Notice
06/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
06/27/2018
Trial Brief
62
06/27/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
63
06/27/2018
Notice (Other)
64
06/28/2018
Supplement
65
06/28/2018
Notice (Other)
66
07/11/2018
Notice (Other)
07/11/2018
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
69
07/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
70
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
71
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
72
07/19/2018
Witness List Public Doc
73
07/19/2018
Exhibit List
74
07/19/2018
Exhibit List
75
07/19/2018
Jury Instructions
76
07/25/2018
Jury Verdict
77
08/29/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
78
09/11/2018
Continue
79
09/12/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
80
09/14/2018
Forfeiture of Property
81
09/14/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
82
11/27/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
83
12/03/2018
Continue
84
12/06/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
85
02/07/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
86
02/07/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
87
02/07/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/08/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
02/12/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
90
02/12/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
91
02/27/2019
Notice (Other)
02/27/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
02/27/2019
Forfeiture of Property
94
02/27/2019
Affidavit
95
02/28/2019
Order
02/28/2019
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
02/28/2019
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
02/28/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
02/28/2019
Judgment
99
02/28/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
100
02/28/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
101
02/28/2019
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
102
03/01/2019
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
103
03/01/2019
USCA Case Number
104
03/01/2019
USCA Time Schedule Order
105
03/19/2019
USCA Order
106
04/07/2019
Designation of Record on Appeal
107
04/07/2019
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
108
05/08/2019
Transcript
109
05/08/2019
Transcript
110
05/08/2019
Transcript
111
05/08/2019
Transcript
112
05/08/2019
Transcript
113
05/08/2019
Transcript
114
05/08/2019
Transcript
115
05/08/2019
Transcript
116
05/08/2019
Transcript
117
05/08/2019
Transcript
118
05/08/2019
Transcript
119
05/08/2019
Transcript
120
05/08/2019
Transcript
121
05/08/2019
Transcript

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.