USA v. Ly et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00005 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
776
05/18/2018
Notice (Other)
777
05/18/2018
Notice (Other)
778
05/30/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
779
05/30/2018
Transcript
780
05/30/2018
Transcript
781
05/30/2018
Transcript
782
05/30/2018
Transcript
783
05/30/2018
Transcript
784
05/30/2018
Transcript
785
05/30/2018
Transcript
786
05/30/2018
Transcript
787
05/31/2018
Notice (Other)
06/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
789
06/07/2018
Response in Opposition
790
06/07/2018
Declaration
791
06/07/2018
Declaration
792
06/07/2018
Declaration
793
06/07/2018
Declaration
794
06/15/2018
Unopposed Motion
795
06/15/2018
Declaration
06/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
797
06/20/2018
Reply to Response
798
06/20/2018
Notice (Other)
799
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
800
06/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
801
06/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
802
06/27/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
803
06/27/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
804
06/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
805
06/27/2018
Declaration
06/29/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
807
07/02/2018
Order on Motion for New Trial
07/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
809
07/05/2018
Notice (Other)
810
07/05/2018
Notice (Other)
07/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
811
07/05/2018
Notice (Other)
814
07/09/2018
Unopposed Motion
815
07/09/2018
Affidavit
07/10/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
818
07/10/2018
Amended Pretrial Services Report
819
07/11/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
820
07/11/2018
Transcript
821
07/12/2018
Transcript
822
07/13/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
823
07/16/2018
USCA Case Number
824
07/16/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order
825
07/16/2018
Judgment
826
07/16/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
827
07/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
07/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
829
07/18/2018
Declaration
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
832
07/20/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
07/23/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
835
08/19/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.