USA v. Mackey
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00124-10314 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
108
02/07/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
109
02/11/2019
Response in Opposition
110
02/14/2019
Order
111
02/22/2019
Response in Support
112
02/26/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
113
02/26/2019
Order
114
02/26/2019
Notice (Other)
115
02/27/2019
Notice (Other)
116
03/04/2019
Order
117
03/04/2019
Notice (Other)
118
03/11/2019
Notice (Other)
119
03/13/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
120
03/19/2019
Order/Judgment Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment
121
03/19/2019
AO 247 - Page 2 Sealed
122
04/04/2019
Unopposed Motion
123
04/05/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion
124
04/05/2019
Amended Judgment
125
04/05/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
126
04/05/2019
Amended Judgment
127
04/05/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.