USA v. Mackey
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00052-14182 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
145
02/07/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
146
02/08/2019
Response in Opposition
147
02/14/2019
Order
148
02/22/2019
Response in Support
149
02/25/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
150
02/26/2019
Order
151
02/26/2019
Notice (Other)
152
02/27/2019
Notice (Other)
153
03/04/2019
Order
154
03/04/2019
Notice (Other)
155
03/11/2019
Notice (Other)
156
03/13/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
157
03/19/2019
Order/Judgment Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment
158
03/19/2019
AO 247 - Page 2 Sealed
159
04/04/2019
Unopposed Motion
160
04/05/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion
161
04/05/2019
Amended Judgment
162
04/05/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
163
04/05/2019
Amended Judgment
164
04/05/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.