USA v. Maggio - Michael a Maggio

4:2015-cr-00001 (ared)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 322 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/09/2015
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Michael A Maggio
2
01/09/2015
INFORMATION as to Michael A Maggio for count 1.
3
01/09/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller: Waiver and Plea Hearing as to Michael A Maggio for count 1 held on 1/9/2015. Guilty Plea entered by Defendant. Defense Marjorie Rogers, AUSA Julie Peters, USPO Kim Lawson, Court Reporter Judy Ammons.
4
01/09/2015
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Michael A Maggio.
5
01/09/2015
PLEA AGREEMENT ADDENDUM re 4 Plea Agreement. (cby). Unsealed per 30 Order.
6
01/09/2015
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Michael A Maggio (1) O/R. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/9/2015. (cby) (The document with defendant's telephone number redacted was substituted as the main document on 1/12/2015, pursuant to instructions from Chambers.)
7
01/12/2015
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 6 Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Michael A Maggio. CORRECTION: The document with Defendant's telephone number redacted was substituted as the attachment for docket entry 6, pursuant to instructions from Chambers. A copy of the redacted Order is attached hereto for service on the parties.
8
01/12/2015
ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release as to Michael A Maggio. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/12/2015.
9
01/13/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael A Maggio - Sentencing set for 7/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller.
10
01/28/2015
TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea Proceedings as to Michael A Maggio held on January 9, 2015 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Court Reporter Judith A. Ammons. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 2/9/2015. Redaction Request due 2/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2015.
11
06/17/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING Continued as to Michael A Maggio: Sentencing reset for 11/20/2015 10:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller.
12
10/15/2015
NOTICE OF HEARING Continued as to Michael A Maggio: Sentencing reset for 2/26/2016 at 10:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (NOTE: previously set 11/20/15)
13
01/29/2016
SEALED MOTION.
14
02/01/2016
SEALED RESPONSE.
15
02/01/2016
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael A Maggio - In Camera Hearing set for 2/2/2016 02:00 PM in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller.
17
02/05/2016
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James Earl Hensley, Jr appearing for Michael A Maggio
18
02/08/2016
SEALED MOTION.
19
02/09/2016
SEALED RESPONSE.
20
02/10/2016
ORDER denying 13 & 18 Motion to be relieved as to Michael A Maggio. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/10/2016.
21
02/12/2016
MOTION to Withdraw Plea of Guilty by Michael A Maggio
22
02/16/2016
MOTION for Order Waiver and Order Declaring Attorney-Client Priviledge Waived by USA as to Michael A Maggio
23
02/16/2016
Third MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lauren Hoover and Marjorie Rogers, by Michael A Maggio
24
02/16/2016
ORDER Granting 22 MOTION for Order Waiver and Order Declaring Attorney-Client Priviledge Waived and 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Michael A Maggio. Lauren Hoover and Marjorie E. Rogers terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/16/2016.
25
02/17/2016
MOTION for Protective Order by Michael A Maggio
26
02/17/2016
BRIEF in Support by Michael A Maggio re 25 MOTION for Protective Order
27
02/17/2016
MOTION to Unseal Document re 5 Plea Addendum by USA as to Michael A Maggio
28
02/18/2016
ORDER re Defendant's Response to 27 MOTION to Unseal 5 Plea Addendum as to Michael A Maggio. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/18/2016.
29
02/18/2016
RESPONSE to Motion by Michael A Maggio re 27 MOTION to Unseal Document re 5 Plea Addendum
30
02/18/2016
ORDER denying 25 Motion for Protective Order and Granting 27 Motion to Unseal 5 Plea Addendum as to Michael A Maggio. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/18/2016.
31
02/19/2016
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Michael A Maggio re 21 MOTION to Withdraw Plea of Guilty
32
02/21/2016
MOTION to Amend/Correct 31 Response to Motion filed by USA by Michael A Maggio
33
02/23/2016
ORDER continuing the sentencing hearing and setting hearing on 21 MOTION to Withdraw Plea of Guilty for February 26, 2016, at 10:30 AM Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/23/2016.
34
02/25/2016
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Michael A Maggio re 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct 31 Response to Motion filed by USA
35
02/26/2016
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Charles R. Walsh appearing for USA.
36
02/26/2016
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) MOTION HEARING held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller as to Michael A Maggio held on 2/26/2016 re 21 32 motion to withdraw plea of guilty. Case called. Parties present: AUSAs - Julie Peters and Pat Harris; Defense - James Earl Hensley, Jr. Nature of proceedings stated on the record. After arguments made on the motion, the court took matter under advisement. Written order to be entered.(Court Reporter Judy Ammons.)
37
03/01/2016
BRIEF Post Hearing by Michael A Maggio
38
03/03/2016
RESPONSE re 37 Brief by USA
39
03/10/2016
ORDER denying 21 Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty and 32 Amended Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty and Dismiss the Information as to Michael A Maggio. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/10/2016.
40
03/10/2016
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael A Maggio. Sentencing set for 3/24/2016 at 1:30 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller.
41
03/18/2016
TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings as to Michael A Maggio held on February 26, 2016 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Court Reporter Judith A. Ammons. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 3/28/2016. Redaction Request due 4/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2016.
42
03/21/2016
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Michael A Maggio
43
03/22/2016
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Michael A Maggio
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
44
03/24/2016
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) SENTENCING held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/24/2016 for Michael A Maggio (1). Case called. Parties present: AUSA Julie Peters; Defense - James Hensley, Jr. Court reviews history of case. Objections to PSR addressed. PSR adopted subject to court's ruling. JUDGMENT: Count 1, 120 months imprisonment; 2 years supervised release; no fine; no restitution; $100 special penalty assessment. Defendant shall report to designated facility to begin his term of imprisonment by 2:00 PM on Monday, May 23, 2016. If no facility has been designated by the Bureau of Prison by that date, defendant shall report to the USMS.(Court Reporter Judy Ammons.)
45
03/28/2016
JUDGMENT as to Michael A Maggio. Count 1, 120 months imprisonment; 2 years supervised release; no fine; no restitution; $100 special penalty assessment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/28/2016.
47
03/30/2016
NOTICE OF APPEAL re 45 Judgment by Michael A Maggio (Docket text modified on 3/30/2016 to establish linkage).
48
03/30/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis by Michael A Maggio
03/30/2016
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 47 Notice of Appeal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to 45 Judgment. (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
03/31/2016
ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis as to Michael A Maggio. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/31/2016.
50
03/31/2016
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to 47 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael A. Maggio re: 45 Judgment. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTS SHOULD BE FILED WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERK.
51
04/01/2016
USCA Docket Letter as to 47 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael A Maggio. USCA Case Number 16-1795. Transcript due by 4/21/2016.
52
04/01/2016
ORDER of USCA as to Michael A Maggio re 47 Notice of Appeal: Attorney James E. Hensley is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal under the Criminal Justice Act. Information regarding the CJA appointment will be emailed to counsel shortly.
53
04/07/2016
LETTER to the Court from Danny Longing. (Docketed pursuant to instructions from the Court.)
55
04/13/2016
TRANSCRIPT of Hearing as to Michael A Maggio held on 2/2/2016 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Court Reporter Judith A. Ammons. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/25/2016. Redaction Request due 5/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2016. (fcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2016: # 1 Main Document - Correct)
56
04/13/2016
TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Proceedings as to Michael A Maggio held on 3/24/2016 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Court Reporter Judith A. Ammons. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/25/2016. Redaction Request due 5/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2016. (fcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2016: # 1 Main Document - Correct)
57
04/13/2016
SEALED TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on February 2, 2016.
58
04/13/2016
SEALED TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on March 24, 2016.
04/13/2016
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 55 Transcript of Hearing and 56 Transcript of Sentencing Proceedings as to Michael A Maggio. CORRECTION: The corrected Transcripts were added as attachment to docket entries 55 and 56. (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
04/19/2016
MOTION for Order Release Pending Appeal by Michael A Maggio
60
04/21/2016
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by USA as to Michael A Maggio
61
04/21/2016
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 60 motion to substitute attorney Patrick Harris in place of Charles Walsh and Edward Sullivan. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/21/16.
62
04/21/2016
Transmitted Record on Appeal as to Michael A Maggio to US Court of Appeals re 47 Notice of Appeal: Copies of Presentence Investigation Report, sealed Statement of Reasons; 10, 41, 55, 56, 57, and 58 Transcripts.
63
04/21/2016
RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Michael A Maggio re 59 MOTION for Order Release Pending Appeal
64
04/22/2016
ORDER granting 59 Motion for Release Pending Appeal as to Michael A Maggio. Defendant is permitted to remain out on bail pending appeal and his release is subject to the same conditions set forth in the 6 Order Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/22/2016.
65
07/03/2017
OPINION of USCA as to Michael A Maggio re 47 Notice of Appeal.
66
07/03/2017
JUDGMENT of USCA as to Michael A Maggio re 47 Notice of Appeal. The judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.

Recommended Reading: