USA v. Malcolm
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00019-59261 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
07/18/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
07/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Notice of Arrest - Other District (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/20/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
8
07/25/2018
Pretrial Services Report
9
07/25/2018
Detention Hearing
10
07/25/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
07/25/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
07/25/2018
Order of Detention
13
08/29/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/31/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
08/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/11/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
20
10/30/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/30/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
11/13/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
23
11/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
24
11/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
25
11/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
26
11/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
27
11/26/2018
Notice (Other)
11/28/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
12/10/2018
Judgment
31
12/10/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.