USA v. Manley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00103 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
126
06/18/2018
Continue
06/18/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
132
08/01/2018
Violation Disposition Report
133
08/07/2018
Notice (Other)
08/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
138
09/18/2018
Memorandum
09/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
142
10/04/2018
Judgment on Revocation
143
10/04/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.