USA v. Manogiamanu
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2010-cr-00020-24757 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
57
01/24/2019
Petition for Warrant of Arrest for Offender - 12C
58
01/24/2019
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
01/25/2019
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
01/28/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
60
02/06/2019
Status Report
61
04/12/2019
Hearing
62
04/15/2019
Response in Opposition
05/01/2019
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
05/24/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
70
05/24/2019
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
05/24/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.