USA v. Manzanares
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

1:2017-cr-00010 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
59
05/25/2018
Unopposed Motion
60
05/25/2018
Notice (Other)
05/29/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
06/01/2018
Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars
06/04/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
06/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.