USA v. Margerum
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00160 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
06/11/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
39
07/02/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
40
07/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
41
07/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/10/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
07/09/2018
Unopposed Motion
44
07/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
45
07/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
46
07/16/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
08/20/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
52
08/27/2018
Judgment
53
08/27/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
09/11/2018
Judgment (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.