USA v. Martin
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00010 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/18/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
07/18/2018
Indictment - For Public
07/20/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/20/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
8
07/23/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
07/23/2018
Order of Detention
10
07/23/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
11
08/20/2018
Unopposed Motion
12
08/20/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
08/23/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/27/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
08/28/2018
Appear
08/29/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.