USA v. Martinez et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00104 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
05/21/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
05/23/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
05/29/2018
Amended Judgment
57
05/29/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
58
05/30/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
59
06/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
60
06/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
61
06/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
62
06/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
63
06/07/2018
Continue
64
06/07/2018
Affidavit
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
67
07/22/2018
Continue
68
07/22/2018
Affidavit
07/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
09/12/2018
Continue
71
09/12/2018
Affidavit
09/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
09/17/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
09/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
11/15/2018
Judgment
79
11/15/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.