USA v. Mattson
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00078-60441 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
4
07/24/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/24/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/24/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
07/24/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
8
07/24/2018
Order of Detention
9
07/30/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
10
08/02/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
11
08/03/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
08/08/2018
Bail Review Hearing
14
08/08/2018
Amended Minute Entry
15
09/20/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/20/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/02/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
21
01/02/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/02/2019
Unopposed Motion
24
01/03/2019
Appear
01/03/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
01/08/2019
Order
28
01/24/2019
Appear
01/25/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
01/28/2019
Status Report
31
01/31/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
02/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
01/31/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
36
02/05/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
37
02/05/2019
Order of Release
02/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
02/22/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
40
02/22/2019
Plea Agreement
41
02/22/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
42
03/04/2019
Notice of Change of Address
43
04/12/2019
Continue
44
04/18/2019
Errata
04/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
04/19/2019
Response in Opposition
04/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
05/03/2019
Reply to Response
51
05/10/2019
Supplement

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.