USA v. McAnulty
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00027 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
71
06/18/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/25/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
07/23/2018
Judgment on Revocation
76
07/23/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.