USA v. McComas
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00030-59411 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
07/05/2018
Information - Felony
29
07/05/2018
Plea Agreement
30
07/05/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
07/09/2018
Waiver of Indictment
07/10/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
07/17/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
38
08/13/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
39
08/31/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
40
08/31/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
41
09/04/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
10/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
46
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
11/01/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
49
11/01/2018
Unopposed Motion
50
11/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
51
11/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/05/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
11/13/2018
Notice (Other)
56
12/03/2018
Judgment
57
12/03/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
58
12/19/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.