USA v. McCright
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2010-cr-00049-27277 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
199
10/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
200
10/23/2018
Order of Detention
201
10/26/2018
Amended Minute Entry
10/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
203
11/02/2018
Notice (Other)
11/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
206
11/14/2018
Violation Disposition Report
207
11/15/2018
Supplement
208
11/16/2018
Memorandum
11/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
210
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
211
12/20/2018
Notice (Other)
12/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
213
12/31/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
214
12/31/2018
Leave to File Document
216
12/31/2018
Supplement
01/01/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
220
01/02/2019
Notice (Other)
221
01/03/2019
Notice (Other)
01/07/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
223
01/16/2019
Judgment on Revocation
224
01/16/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.