USA v. McGee
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00107-60777 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
3
10/10/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
10/10/2018
Notice of Arrest - Other District (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/14/2018
Pretrial Services Report
11/14/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/14/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
8
11/14/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
10
11/14/2018
Order of Detention
11
11/26/2018
Protective Order
12
11/28/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
13
12/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
14
12/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
01/02/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
02/15/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
02/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/25/2019
Plea Agreement
19
02/25/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
02/27/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
02/27/2019
Forfeiture of Property
23
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
24
03/12/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
25
04/08/2019
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)
26
04/10/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
27
05/01/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
05/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
05/06/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.