USA v. McTigue
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00105-56279 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
35
06/11/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
36
06/12/2018
Order
37
04/22/2019
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
38
04/22/2019
Order
05/09/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
05/10/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
44
05/10/2019
Order of Detention
05/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.