USA v. Medina-Delacruz
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00127 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
10/11/2018
Pretrial Services Report
8
10/11/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
10/12/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
10/12/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
10/12/2018
Order of Detention
12
10/12/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
13
10/24/2018
Protective Order
14
10/24/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
15
10/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
17
11/01/2018
Hearing
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
11/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
11/02/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
22
11/05/2018
Bail Review Hearing
23
11/05/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
24
11/05/2018
Order of Release
25
11/06/2018
Passport Surrendered
11/27/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.