USA v. Meganack et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00083 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
75
06/27/2018
Continue
06/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
07/09/2018
Plea Agreement
78
07/09/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
79
07/09/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
07/09/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
07/11/2018
Forfeiture of Property
83
07/12/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
84
07/30/2018
Unopposed Motion
85
07/31/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
86
08/21/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
87
09/12/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
88
09/19/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
90
09/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
91
09/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
92
09/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
93
09/21/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
94
09/26/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings
95
10/30/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
96
10/31/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
97
11/01/2018
Supplement
98
11/01/2018
Notice (Other)
11/01/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
99
11/01/2018
Supplement
11/08/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
11/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
103
11/16/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
104
11/20/2018
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.