USA v. Meganack et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00083-57912 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
110
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
111
04/24/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
05/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
05/07/2019
Notice (Other)
114
05/15/2019
Unopposed Motion
05/16/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.