USA v. Mejia-Zayas
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00404 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/27/2018
Complaint
07/27/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/30/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/31/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/31/2018
Order of Detention
7
08/01/2018
Continue
08/01/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
08/02/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
10
08/02/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11
08/02/2018
Vacate
12
08/02/2018
Vacate
13
08/02/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
08/02/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/03/2018
Notice (Other)
16
08/06/2018
Order
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Preliminary Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
20
08/21/2018
Amended Minute Entry
21
08/21/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
22
08/21/2018
Order of Release
08/23/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.