USA v. Mejia et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00034 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
341
06/26/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
342
06/26/2018
Declaration
343
06/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
344
08/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
345
08/20/2018
Declaration
346
08/21/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
347
10/23/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
348
10/23/2018
Declaration
349
10/23/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
350
11/27/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
351
11/27/2018
Declaration
352
11/27/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.