USA v. Messinger
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00170 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
05/22/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
29
05/30/2018
Unopposed Motion
30
05/30/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/31/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
05/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
33
05/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
34
06/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
35
06/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
06/01/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
06/01/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
38
06/07/2018
Sentencing
40
06/11/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
41
06/14/2018
Judgment
42
06/14/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.