USA v. Miller
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00009 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
4
07/27/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
07/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/02/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/02/2018
Pretrial Services Report
8
08/03/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
9
08/03/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney
10
08/03/2018
Continue
11
08/03/2018
Affidavit
12
08/03/2018
Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/15/2018
Notice (Other)
08/15/2018
Order on Motion to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/24/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
19
08/24/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
20
08/30/2018
Continue
21
09/04/2018
Waiver of Speedy Trial
09/19/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
10/18/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
10/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
11/05/2018
Notice (Other)
11/05/2018
Attorney Appointment Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
11/06/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
11/19/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 Request No Action
36
11/19/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/19/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
11/27/2018
Appear
40
11/27/2018
Order
11/29/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
12/11/2018
Continue
43
12/11/2018
Declaration

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.