USA v. Miller
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00084-60458 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/18/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
07/18/2018
Indictment - For Public
07/19/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/19/2018
Appear
07/19/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/20/2018
Pretrial Services Report
8
07/20/2018
Notice (Other)
9
07/20/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
07/23/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
07/23/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
12
07/23/2018
Order of Detention
13
07/23/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
14
08/02/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
08/09/2018
Notice (Other)
17
08/10/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
08/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/11/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
09/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
01/15/2019
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
29
01/15/2019
Indictment - For Public
01/16/2019
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.