USA v. Minnick
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00172 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
06/19/2018
Notice (Other)
39
06/20/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
40
06/25/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
06/25/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
10/08/2018
Hearing
10/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
10/18/2018
Modify Conditions of Release
45
10/22/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
46
10/22/2018
Response in Opposition
47
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
10/22/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
10/23/2018
Order
10/23/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
11/05/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
51
11/23/2018
Continue
52
11/26/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.