USA v. Minnick
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00172-58871 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
06/19/2018
Notice (Other)
39
06/20/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
40
06/25/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
06/25/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
10/08/2018
Hearing
10/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
10/18/2018
Modify Conditions of Release
45
10/22/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
46
10/22/2018
Response in Opposition
47
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
10/22/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
10/23/2018
Order
10/23/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
11/05/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
51
11/23/2018
Continue
52
11/26/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
04/16/2019
Continue
04/17/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
04/17/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
57
04/17/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
58
04/18/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
59
04/18/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
60
04/19/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/19/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
04/22/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
63
04/23/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
64
04/23/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
65
04/23/2019
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
04/23/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
04/30/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
69
04/30/2019
Judgment
70
04/30/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.