USA v. Modeste
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00013-48786 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
48
02/27/2019
Appoint Counsel
02/27/2019
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
52
03/14/2019
Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release
53
03/18/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
54
03/21/2019
Response in Opposition

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.