USA v. Moen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00090-48511 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
52
06/15/2018
Z-Recommendation for Participation in AK Hope Court
53
06/15/2018
Z-Order of Referral to the Alaska Hope Court
06/22/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/20/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
12/28/2018
Z-Order Terminating Participant from the Alaska Hope Court Program
02/25/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
02/26/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
02/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Order of Recusal (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
02/26/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
77
02/26/2019
Order of Detention
02/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
03/01/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
81
03/01/2019
Order of Release
84
03/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
03/12/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
03/12/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
03/15/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
03/15/2019
Order of Detention
89
03/15/2019
Order of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.