USA v. Moore et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2004-cr-00004 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
291
05/29/2018
Plea Agreement
292
05/29/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/30/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
294
10/03/2018
Violation Disposition Report
10/11/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
296
10/19/2018
Judgment on Revocation
297
10/19/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.