USA v. Moore
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00113 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
49
08/26/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
08/28/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
08/28/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
53
08/28/2018
Notice (Other)
54
08/28/2018
Order of Detention
55
09/12/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
09/28/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
10/11/2018
Violation Disposition Report
10/22/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
10/22/2018
Judgment on Revocation
61
10/22/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.