USA v. Moore
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2010-cr-00044 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
80
10/03/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
10/24/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
10/29/2018
Notice (Other)
10/30/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
10/30/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
86
10/30/2018
Order of Detention
11/01/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
11/01/2018
Notice (Other)
89
11/01/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
90
11/01/2018
Order of Release
91
11/15/2018
Warrant Returned Executed

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.