USA v. Moore
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00105 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
32
06/04/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
33
06/04/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
06/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
06/11/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
38
06/11/2018
Notice (Other)
39
06/11/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
40
06/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
41
06/13/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
42
06/13/2018
Summons Returned Executed
43
06/19/2018
Response in Opposition
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
07/25/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
09/24/2018
Order - Sealed pdf
09/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
09/28/2018
Violation Disposition Report
10/03/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
10/03/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
10/09/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
10/09/2018
Order of Detention
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.