USA v. Moore
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00040-59541 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
05/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
29
05/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
30
05/29/2018
Amended Minute Entry
31
05/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
32
06/01/2018
Response in Opposition
06/04/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
06/07/2018
Supplement
35
06/08/2018
DEPS Notice
36
06/08/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
37
06/11/2018
Amended Minute Entry
38
06/11/2018
Order
39
06/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
40
06/22/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
07/09/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
08/02/2018
Suppress
43
08/03/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
08/06/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
08/07/2018
Continue
08/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
08/15/2018
DEPS Notice
08/15/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
08/16/2018
Continue
08/17/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
08/16/2018
Response in Opposition
53
08/23/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
54
08/23/2018
Indictment - For Public
55
08/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
56
08/23/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
08/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
57
08/23/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
08/28/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/30/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
08/30/2018
Response in Opposition
08/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
09/03/2018
Motion Hearing
64
09/03/2018
Witness List Public Doc
65
09/03/2018
Exhibit List
66
09/04/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/04/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
09/04/2018
Notice (Other)
70
09/05/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
71
09/05/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
72
09/05/2018
Order of Detention
73
09/05/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
77
09/11/2018
Transcript
09/11/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
09/13/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
80
09/14/2018
Reconsideration
81
09/17/2018
Order
82
09/19/2018
Response in Opposition
83
09/19/2018
Declaration
84
09/20/2018
Reply to Response
09/25/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
09/20/2018
Leave to File Document
87
09/27/2018
Notice (Other)
88
10/01/2018
Order
89
10/02/2018
Order
90
10/10/2018
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
10/10/2018
Docket Annotation re Incorrect PDF Associated (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
10/11/2018
Joinder
10/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
94
10/16/2018
Notice (Other)
95
10/17/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
97
10/24/2018
Objection to Report and Recommendations
10/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
99
10/31/2018
Response in Opposition
100
11/29/2018
Report and Recommendation - Final
101
12/03/2018
Leave to File Document
102
12/03/2018
Sever Defendant
103
12/03/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
104
12/03/2018
Declaration
12/07/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
12/10/2018
Notice (Other)
12/10/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
12/13/2018
Order on Motion to Suppress
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
110
12/13/2018
Notice (Other)
111
12/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
112
12/14/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
12/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
116
12/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
119
12/21/2018
Response in Opposition
120
12/31/2018
Order on Motion to Suppress
121
01/02/2019
Leave to File Document
01/03/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
123
01/03/2019
Order on Motion to Sever Defendant
124
01/11/2019
Trial Brief
125
01/17/2019
DEPS Notice
126
01/17/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
01/19/2019
Continue
129
01/19/2019
Declaration
130
01/21/2019
Response in Opposition
01/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
133
01/22/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
01/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
136
02/20/2019
In Limine
02/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
139
03/01/2019
Response in Opposition
141
03/05/2019
In Limine
142
03/05/2019
In Limine
143
03/05/2019
In Limine
144
03/05/2019
In Limine
145
03/05/2019
In Limine
146
03/05/2019
In Limine
147
03/05/2019
In Limine
148
03/05/2019
In Limine
149
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
150
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
151
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
152
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
153
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
154
03/13/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
155
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
156
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
157
03/13/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
158
03/14/2019
Continue
159
03/15/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
160
03/18/2019
Continue
161
03/18/2019
Reply to Response
162
03/20/2019
Memorandum
163
03/21/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
03/26/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
165
03/27/2019
Joinder to Motion
168
04/02/2019
DEPS Notice
04/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
171
04/03/2019
Supplement
172
04/04/2019
Supplement
04/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
176
04/04/2019
Continue
178
04/08/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
179
04/08/2019
Proposed Voir Dire
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
180
04/08/2019
Trial Brief
182
04/09/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
04/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
187
04/10/2019
Notice (Other)
189
04/11/2019
Memorandum
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
193
04/17/2019
Order
194
04/17/2019
Order on Motion in Limine
195
04/21/2019
Reconsideration
196
04/22/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
197
04/22/2019
Order
199
05/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
05/02/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
200
05/01/2019
Notice (Other)
202
05/03/2019
Order
203
05/06/2019
Proposed Voir Dire
204
05/06/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
205
05/06/2019
Trial Brief
207
05/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
208
05/16/2019
Order
209
05/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
210
05/17/2019
Amended Minute Entry
211
05/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
213
05/18/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
214
05/18/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
215
05/19/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
216
05/20/2019
Transcript
217
05/20/2019
Transcript
218
05/20/2019
Transcript
219
05/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
221
05/23/2019
Jury Trial
222
05/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
223
05/23/2019
Jury Trial
224
05/23/2019
Witness List
225
05/23/2019
Exhibit List
226
05/23/2019
Exhibit List
227
05/23/2019
Jury Instructions
228
05/23/2019
Jury Instructions
229
05/23/2019
Jury Verdict

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.