USA v. Moore
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00040-60610 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
124
01/11/2019
Trial Brief
125
01/17/2019
DEPS Notice
126
01/17/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
128
01/19/2019
Continue
129
01/19/2019
Declaration
130
01/21/2019
Response in Opposition
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
134
01/22/2019
Additional Related Document
01/23/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
136
02/20/2019
In Limine
02/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
140
03/01/2019
Response in Opposition
149
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
150
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
151
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
152
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
153
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
154
03/13/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
155
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
156
03/13/2019
Response in Opposition
157
03/13/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
158
03/14/2019
Continue
159
03/15/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
160
03/18/2019
Continue
163
03/21/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
165
03/27/2019
Joinder to Motion
166
03/28/2019
In Limine
167
04/01/2019
Response in Opposition
168
04/02/2019
DEPS Notice
04/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
171
04/03/2019
Supplement
172
04/04/2019
Supplement
173
04/04/2019
In Limine
174
04/04/2019
Leave to File Document
175
04/04/2019
Declaration
04/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
176
04/04/2019
Continue
178
04/08/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
179
04/08/2019
Proposed Voir Dire
04/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
180
04/08/2019
Trial Brief
183
04/09/2019
Response in Opposition
184
04/10/2019
Continue
185
04/10/2019
Declaration
04/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
187
04/10/2019
Notice (Other)
188
04/11/2019
Errata
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/15/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
193
04/17/2019
Order
194
04/17/2019
Order on Motion in Limine
195
04/21/2019
Reconsideration
196
04/22/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
197
04/22/2019
Order
198
04/26/2019
Response in Opposition
199
05/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
05/02/2019
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
200
05/01/2019
Notice (Other)
202
05/03/2019
Order
204
05/06/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
206
05/06/2019
Trial Brief
207
05/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
208
05/16/2019
Order
209
05/16/2019
Jury Trial
210
05/17/2019
Amended Minute Entry
211
05/17/2019
Jury Trial
212
05/17/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.