USA v. Mullen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00013 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
61
06/08/2018
Subsequent Petition for Offender - 12C
62
06/08/2018
Order
06/12/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
06/12/2018
Notice (Other)
65
06/12/2018
Order of Detention
66
06/13/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
06/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
07/17/2018
Violation Disposition Report
07/19/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
07/26/2018
Judgment on Revocation
74
07/26/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.