USA v. Munhoven
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2013-cr-00012-49948 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
90
12/06/2018
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
12/06/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
12/10/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
97
12/10/2018
Notice (Other)
98
12/10/2018
Order of Detention
100
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
101
12/20/2018
Notice (Other)
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
01/29/2019
Appear
01/29/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
105
01/29/2019
Errata
01/29/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
01/29/2019
Appear
01/29/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
111
04/05/2019
Appear
04/08/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
04/24/2019
Violation Disposition Report
114
04/29/2019
Notice (Other)
04/30/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
116
04/30/2019
Judgment on Revocation
117
04/30/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.