USA v. Murguia et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2010-cr-00076-29315 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
162
04/25/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
163
04/26/2019
Order
164
05/03/2019
Response in Opposition
165
05/06/2019
Order
166
05/17/2019
Reply to Response

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.