USA v. Muse et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00065-60199 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
06/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
06/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
21
06/20/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
22
06/20/2018
Indictment - For Public
06/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
06/21/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
26
06/21/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
06/26/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
06/26/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
30
06/26/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
31
08/03/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
08/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
08/09/2018
Plea Agreement
36
08/09/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
08/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
08/27/2018
Continue
08/27/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
08/27/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
08/29/2018
Response in Opposition
08/29/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
08/29/2018
Notice (Other)
45
08/29/2018
Appear
51
09/04/2018
Trial Brief
52
09/04/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
53
09/04/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
54
09/04/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
55
09/04/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
56
09/04/2018
Trial Brief
57
09/05/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
58
09/05/2018
Notice (Other)
09/11/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
09/11/2018
Waiver of Indictment
09/12/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
09/13/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
65
09/14/2018
Hearing
09/18/2018
Order Referring Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
09/21/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
69
09/25/2018
Bail Review Hearing
70
09/25/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
71
09/25/2018
Order of Release
72
09/26/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed
73
10/03/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
74
10/15/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
75
10/25/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
76
10/26/2018
Continue
11/05/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
11/05/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
79
11/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
80
11/09/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
81
11/13/2018
Continue
11/13/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
01/08/2019
Continue
88
01/08/2019
Declaration
01/09/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
02/08/2019
Continue
02/08/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
03/13/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
103
03/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
104
03/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
105
03/15/2019
Supplement
03/21/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
04/01/2019
Judgment
116
04/01/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.