USA v. Nash
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00071-60253 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
06/21/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
15
06/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
06/22/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
06/25/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
19
06/26/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
20
06/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
08/22/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
08/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/28/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
10/16/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
30
11/06/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
31
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
32
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
33
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
34
11/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/27/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
11/29/2018
Judgment
37
11/29/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.