USA v. Naughton
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00177 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
34
06/14/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
35
07/05/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
36
07/12/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
37
07/12/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
38
07/16/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
39
07/16/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/16/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
07/16/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
43
07/26/2018
Notice (Other)
44
07/26/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
45
07/27/2018
Notice (Other)
07/27/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
07/30/2018
Notice (Other)
07/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
08/03/2018
Sentencing
51
08/10/2018
Judgment
52
08/10/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.