USA v. Neely
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00008 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
3
06/13/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
06/19/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
07/17/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/17/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/19/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
07/19/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
08/30/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
13
08/31/2018
Plea Agreement
14
08/31/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
08/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/11/2018
Forfeiture of Property
25
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
26
11/05/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
27
11/09/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/14/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.