USA v. Nekeferoff
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00071 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
160
07/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
161
07/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
162
07/16/2018
Continue
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
165
09/11/2018
Continue
09/13/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
167
10/15/2018
Continue
10/16/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
169
12/07/2018
Continue
12/07/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.