USA v. Nekeferoff
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00071-54069 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
160
07/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
161
07/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
162
07/16/2018
Continue
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
165
09/11/2018
Continue
09/13/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
167
10/15/2018
Continue
10/16/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
169
12/07/2018
Continue
12/07/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
173
01/07/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
174
01/10/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
01/10/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/10/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
178
01/23/2019
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
179
01/24/2019
Judgment
180
01/24/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
181
01/25/2019
USCA Case Number
182
01/25/2019
USCA Time Schedule Order
183
02/19/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
02/22/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
186
03/22/2019
USCA Order
187
04/17/2019
USCA Order
188
04/30/2019
USCA Order
189
05/22/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
190
05/22/2019
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
191
05/22/2019
Designation of Record on Appeal
192
05/24/2019
Unopposed Motion
193
05/24/2019
Declaration

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.