USA v. Newsome
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00130 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
06/01/2018
Plea Agreement
34
06/01/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/06/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
37
07/26/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
38
08/09/2018
Forfeiture of Property
39
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
40
08/16/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
41
08/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
42
08/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
43
08/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
44
08/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
09/05/2018
Judgment
49
09/05/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.