USA v. Nichols et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00050-59891 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
05/18/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
19
06/21/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
20
06/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
21
06/21/2018
Additional Related Document
22
06/22/2018
Order
23
06/25/2018
Response to Order to Show Cause
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
06/25/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
06/25/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
06/26/2018
Plea Agreement
30
06/26/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
31
06/27/2018
Plea Agreement
32
06/27/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
07/02/2018
Notice (Other)
38
09/17/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
39
09/17/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
40
09/27/2018
Continue
41
09/27/2018
Declaration
10/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
10/03/2018
Continue
44
10/03/2018
Affidavit
45
10/05/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
10/22/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
49
10/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
50
10/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
51
10/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
52
10/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
53
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
54
11/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
55
11/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
56
11/02/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
57
11/02/2018
Declaration
11/05/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
11/05/2018
Errata
60
11/05/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/14/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
11/14/2018
Order
64
11/14/2018
Order
65
11/15/2018
Judgment
66
11/15/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
67
11/15/2018
Judgment
68
11/15/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
69
12/07/2018
Order
70
12/07/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.