USA v. Nicholson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00151-58676 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
233
01/30/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
241
02/12/2019
Continue
242
02/12/2019
Declaration
02/18/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
257
03/13/2019
Continue
258
03/13/2019
Declaration
03/15/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
288
05/17/2019
Modify Conditions of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.