USA v. Nicholson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00151-58677 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
217
01/15/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
219
01/15/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
220
01/21/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
226
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
227
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
228
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
229
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
230
01/29/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/29/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
234
01/30/2019
Notice (Other)
01/31/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
235
01/30/2019
Notice (Other)
251
03/01/2019
Judgment
252
03/01/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.