USA v. Nicholson et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00151-58678 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
221
01/21/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
222
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
223
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
224
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
225
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/05/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
238
02/06/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
246
02/20/2019
Judgment
247
02/20/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.